Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Creagh

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1642Born
3 Jan 166623.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Feb 166623.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 167633.8AppointedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
26 May 167633.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
2 Sep 169250.1SelectedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
9 Mar 169350.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
25 Jul 170563.0DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Peter Creagh
Archbishop Peter Creagh (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrageen, Co. Limerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopS. Isidoro, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceStrasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Buried Place (Original)St. Stephen's, Church, Strasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg, France

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171, and Page 189
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 30
  • b: CB, 10 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,080
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 26, and Page 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast