Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Crasso

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500Born
12 Mar 156565.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Oct 156565.8AppointedCardinal-Priest
8 Feb 156666.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
6 Mar 156666.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia
29 Aug 156666.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Crasso
Francesco Cardinal Crasso (born 1500, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast