Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio (Giovanni Andrea) Cardinal Cortese, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Administrator of Urbino, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1483Born
16 Aug 150421.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 150825.3ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jun 154259.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Oct 154259.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
6 Nov 154259.8AppointedAdministrator of Urbino, Italy
21 Sep 154865.7DiedAdministrator of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (Giovanni Andrea) Cortese
Gregorio (Giovanni Andrea) Cardinal Cortese O.S.B. (born 1483, died ) Administrator of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018