Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Bernardino Beltrão Freire

Deceased

Bishop of Pinhel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1754BornCarapito
30 Mar 179742.6SelectedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
23 Sep 179743.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 179743.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 179743.3ConfirmedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
1798²43.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
19 Jul 182873.9DiedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Bernardino Beltrão Freire
Bishop Bernardo Bernardino Beltrão Freire (born , died ) Bishop of Pinhel

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016