Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio de Córdoba, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jun 1633AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
21 Aug 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
9 Jun 1638DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio de Córdoba
Bishop Ambrosio de Córdoba O.P. (died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 347
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 158, Number 997
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast