Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Corbelli

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1634³BornFano
22 Nov 167137.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Nov 167137.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 170167.3AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
24 Jun 170873.9DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Corbelli:
Bishop Pietro Corbelli (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 357
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015