Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Yves (Marie-Joseph) Cardinal Congar, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Cardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1904Born
8 Dec 192925.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Dec 192925.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Jul 193026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Nov 199490.6Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199490.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
22 Jun 199591.2DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

MicroData Summary for Yves (Marie-Joseph) Congar (VIAF: 31994764)
Yves (Marie-Joseph) Cardinal Congar O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedan, Archdiocese of Reims, France
Ordained DeaconLille, Diocese of Lille, France
Ordained PriestSte Trinité of "Le Saulchoir", Convent, Kain-la-Tombe, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • sole/od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jul 2018

Quantcast