Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Confetti (Confetto)

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1623AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
9 Jan 1623AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
22 Jan 1623Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
8 Jan 1630SucceededBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
13 Apr 1643AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
1644¹DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Confetti (Confetto):
Bishop Clemente Confetti (Confetto) Bishop of Acerno

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 249, and Page 66
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013