Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Colonna

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
16 Jun 164245.4AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
29 Jun 164245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
29 Jun 165356.4DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Colonna
Bishop Francesco Colonna (born 1597, died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilazzo

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast