Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benoît-Théophile de Chevron Villette

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1587BornTurin
14 Mar 161527.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 163245.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
16 Jan 163345.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
16 Jun 165871.1DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Benoît-Théophile de Chevron Villette:
Archbishop Benoît-Théophile de Chevron Villette (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015