Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cesi

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
15 Feb 156636.1AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
31 Mar 156636.2Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
30 Nov 1606³76.9DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cesi
Bishop Angelo Cesi (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSacristy, Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi

  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,592
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018