Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Cercito Bereterra

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1585AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
2 Mar 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
15 Aug 1595DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Cercito Bereterra
Bishop Miguel Cercito Bereterra (died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEjea de los Caballeros, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceGraus, Diocese of Huesca

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 97, Number 609
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 129
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast