Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Malaquías Asso, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542²BornLa Muela
19 Jul 159149.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
19 Jul 159149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
29 Sep 159149.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
23 May 159452.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Aug 160664.6DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malaquías Asso:
Bishop Malaquías Asso O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214, and Page 324
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 103, Number 653
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015