Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Abbondio Cardinal Castiglioni

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1523Born
9 Jan 156238.9AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
12 Mar 156542.1Elevated to Cardinal
8 Feb 156643.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
14 Nov 156845.7DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Abbondio Castiglioni (VIAF: 52863492)
Francesco Abbondio Cardinal Castiglioni (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 3.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 136
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,562, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast