Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Casador

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1510BornVic
27 Mar 153524.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 156049.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
29 Jun 156049.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Xanguien
10 Nov 156050.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Xanguien
4 Jun 156150.7SucceededBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Nov 157060.1DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Casador:
Bishop Guillermo Casador (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 69, Number 403
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129, and Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013