Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Casador

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480²BornVich
17 May 154666.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Jun 154666.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
4 Jun 156181.4DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Casador:
Bishop Jaime Casador (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 58, Number 320
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013