Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1517Born
7 Jun 155538.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Aug 155538.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
15 Apr 155740.0Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
31 Jan 156042.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
4 Mar 156143.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

MicroData Summary for Carlo Carafa (VIAF: 191651383)
Carlo Cardinal Carafa (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Italy
Death PlaceCastello Sant'Angelo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Traspontina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1555
  • od/c0: CB, 28 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017