Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Caracciolo

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1675Born
16 Feb 171034.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Feb 171034.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 171034.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
27 Apr 171034.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
10 May 171034.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
25 Nov 171641.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
17 Jan 171842.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Caracciolo (VIAF: 315964551)
Archbishop Giacomo Caracciolo (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Switzerland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartina Franca, Archdiocese of Taranto, Italy
Ordained BishopGesù, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMartina Franca, Archdiocese of Taranto, Italy

  • a priest for 7.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 20
  • ob/c2: AT, 22 Jul 2018
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 Jul 2018

Quantcast