Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Hurtado de Mendoza y Sarmiento

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1560AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
11 Sep 1577AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
19 Apr 1586DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Hurtado de Mendoza y Sarmiento:
Bishop Alvaro Hurtado de Mendoza y Sarmiento (died ) Bishop of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 70, Number 409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 92, and Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014