Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino Buratti

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornRoma
12 Jan 161541.0AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
5 Apr 161541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
9 Jan 162349.0AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
11 Apr 162854.2DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Buratti:
Archbishop Bernardino Buratti (died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374, and Page 316
  • ob/c2: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 68, Number 398
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015