Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Polydor de Brixen, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1524AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
16 Mar 1524AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
2 Apr 1524Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
26 Apr 1534DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Polydor de Brixen
Bishop Polydor de Brixen O. Cist. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,467
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast