Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas de Debrenthe (Branche), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1454AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
2 Mar 1455Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
13 Jan 1463AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
1484¹DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas de Debrenthe (Branche) (VIAF: 17659485)
Bishop Thomas de Debrenthe (Branche) O.S.B. (died 1484) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria n Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 271, and Page 204
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,602
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1455, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Aug 2018

Quantcast