Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Brancaccio

Deceased

Administrator of Tricarico

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateEventTitle
Jan 1405²AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
30 Jul 1405AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
6 Jun 1411Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jun 1411AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
1417²ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
11 Sep 1419AppointedAdministrator of Tricarico, Italy
8 Sep 1427DiedAdministrator of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Brancaccio:
Cardinal Tommaso Brancaccio (died ) Administrator of Tricarico

  • a cardinal for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013