Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal Bourbon de Vend˘me

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Rouen, France

Titular See: (never ordained priest or bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1562Born
1 Aug 158220.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
12 Dec 158321.7Elevated to Cardinal
1586²23.7AppointedAdministrator of Bayeux, France
1590²27.7ResignedAdministrator of Bayeux, France
9 May 159028.1SucceededArchbishop of Rouen, France
30 Jul 159432.3DiedArchbishop-Elect of Rouen, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Bourbon de Vend˘me (VIAF: 252805423)
Charles Cardinal Bourbon de Vend˘me (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGandelus-en-Brie
Death PlaceSt-Germain-des-PrÚs, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Chartreuse of Gaillon

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018