Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Reginald de Bourbon

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1468AppointedBishop of Laon, France
16 Dec 1472AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
7 Jun 1482DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Reginald de Bourbon
Archbishop Reginald de Bourbon (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 173, and Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1468, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast