Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rodrigo Luis Cardinal de Borja y de Castro-Pinós

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524²BornGandía, Spain
22 Dec 153612.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153713.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
6 Aug 153713.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Luis de Borja y de Castro-Pinós:
Rodrigo Luis Cardinal de Borja y de Castro-Pinós (born 1524, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015