Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lawrence Booth

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420Born
22 Aug 145737.6AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 145737.7Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
31 Jul 147656.5AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
19 May 148060.3DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Booth
Archbishop Lawrence Booth (born 1420, died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSherburn in Elmet

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147, and Page 148
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,607
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 111, and Page 292
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,457, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast