Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Gilbert

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Mar 1436SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
21 May 1436ConfirmedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1436Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 1448DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Gilbert
Bishop Robert Gilbert (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCarmelite, Church, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 179
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast