Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Bonard, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1581AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
29 Jan 1592ResignedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
30 Nov 1595DiedBishop Emeritus of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

MicroData Summary for François Bonard
Bishop François Bonard O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontreal du Gers
Death PlaceGrimont, Gers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast