Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bollani

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1514Born
15 Mar 155945.0AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
12 Aug 157965.5DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bollani (VIAF: 14874695)
Bishop Domenico Bollani (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Oct 2017