Catholic-Hierarchy DC

René Cardinal de Birague

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodève, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1507Born
1573²65.9AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
21 Feb 157871.0Elevated to Cardinal
1580²72.9ResignedBishop of Lodève, France
24 Nov 158376.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodève, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René de Birague (VIAF: 38099469)
René Cardinal de Birague (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Catherine de Val des Écoliers, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 45*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast