Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop András Berkes

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹BornPásztó
17 Dec 169428.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
Dec 1695³29.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 172155.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
1 Sep 172155.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
29 Mar 172963.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for András Berkes:
Archbishop András Berkes (born 1666, died ) Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 34
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016