Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mendo de Benavides

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹BornSantisteban del Puerto
18 Jul 163364.5AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Jan 163465.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
19 Nov 164071.8AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
17 Oct 164475.7DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mendo de Benavides:
Bishop Mendo de Benavides (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,843
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136, and Page 310
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 159, Number 1,006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015