Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Benavente, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornSalamanca, Spain
166317.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Oct 169852.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
20 Oct 169852.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
30 May 170054.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
20 Mar 170963.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Benavente:
Bishop Alvaro Benavente O.E.S.A. (born 1646, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 19, Number 2
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016