Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Bembo, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Administrator of Bergamo

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1470BornVenice
20 Dec 153868.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
153968.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
10 Nov 153969.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 153969.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
29 Jul 154171.2AppointedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
15 Feb 154271.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
18 Feb 154473.7AppointedAdministrator of Bergamo, Italy
17 Oct 154474.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
19 Jan 154776.7DiedAdministrator of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bembo:
Cardinal Pietro Bembo O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Administrator of Bergamo

  • a priest for 8.0 years
  • a cardinal for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013