Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionigi Gioacchino Belmont, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1664³BornClaresti
19 May 168723.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 172965.2SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
28 Nov 172965.5ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
3 Sep 173066.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
Dec 1732³68.5DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionigi Gioacchino Belmont:
Bishop Dionigi Gioacchino Belmont O.S.M. (born , died Dec 1732) Bishop of Alghero

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,039
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015