Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Oleksiy Bazyuk

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Bosnia-Hercegovina (Ukrainian)

Priest of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1873Born
9 Apr 189825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
9 Oct 191441.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bosnia-Hercegovina (Ukrainian)
1925¹51.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Bosnia-Hercegovina (Ukrainian)
12 Jun 195279.2DiedPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oleksiy Bazyuk
Father Oleksiy Bazyuk (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Bosnia-Hercegovina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobriany, Ukraine
Death PlaceLavochne, Ukraine

  • a priest for 54.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 6 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 10 Sep 2018

Quantcast