Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Bartolucci

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata

Titular See: (Director/Pontifical Musical Choir "Sistina")


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1917BornBorgo San Lorenzo, Italy
23 Dec 193922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
195638.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
29 May 199780.1RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
20 Nov 201093.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201093.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata
28 Sep 201194.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata
11 Nov 201396.5DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bartolucci:
Cardinal Domenico Bartolucci (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 73.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 2010
  • b: JPG
  • i: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2011
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Nov 2013