Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Onofrio Bartolini de’ Medici

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508¹Born
10 Sep 151810.6AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
30 Nov 153123.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
27 Dec 155547.9DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Bartolini de’ Medici
Archbishop Onofrio Bartolini de’ Medici (born 1508, died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Nov 2016
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1531, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast