Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petăr Bogdan Bakšič, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601²Born
13 Feb 163837.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
13 Feb 163837.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
15 Jun 164140.4SucceededBishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
6 Dec 164241.9AppointedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
1 Sep 1674³73.6DiedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petăr Bogdan Bakšič (VIAF: 47673907)
Archbishop Petăr Bogdan Bakšič O.F.M. Obs. (born 1601, died ) Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiprovtsi, Diocese of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)
Death PlaceChiprovtsi, Archdiocese of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 319, and Page 130
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,638, Number 37
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast