Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Banchieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1694Born
26 Nov 175359.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175359.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
18 Oct 176369.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Banchieri (VIAF: 89085869)
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Banchieri (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast