Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Ballantine

Deceased

Prefect of Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618Born
3 Dec 164527.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 165335.7AppointedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain
2 Sep 166143.6DiedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Ballantine
Father William Ballantine (born 1618, died ) Prefect of Scotland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDouglas, South Lanarkshire

  • a priest for 15.7 years

Source(s):
  • bp: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018