Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso das Asturias

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1302AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
6 May 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Nov 1306AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Jan 1309DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso das Asturias:
Bishop Alfonso das Asturias (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 300, Number 126
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 291, and Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014