Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Aponte Quiñones, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1585AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
31 Mar 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
31 Aug 1598AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
24 Apr 1599DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Aponte Quiñones (VIAF: 87172374)
Bishop Diego Aponte Quiñones O.S. (died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillarejo, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopSantiago, Madrid

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 229
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 96, Number 604
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast