Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luigi Antonio Appiani, C.M. †

Deceased

Priest of Congregation of the Mission

Titular See: (declined the nomination)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1663Born
20 May 168724.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 168926.1ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1715¹51.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
1715²51.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
1715¹51.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
1715²51.7ResignedTitular Bishop-Elect of Myriophytos
29 Aug 173269.4DiedPriest of Congregation of the Mission

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Antonio Appiani
Father Luigi Antonio Appiani C.M. (born , died ) Priest of Congregation of the Mission

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDogliani, Diocese of Saluzzo, Italy
Death PlacePrison, Macau, Diocese of Macau, China

  • a priest for 45.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast