Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Anaya Maldonado

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1384AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
28 Jun 1390AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
16 Oct 1392AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
13 Sep 1407AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
16 Mar 1418AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
7 Jan 1433AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
25 Feb 1435AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
1438¹DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Anaya Maldonado
Archbishop Diego de Anaya Maldonado (died 1438) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165, and Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 278, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 429, and Page 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast