Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Busso von Alvensleben

Deceased

Bishop of Havelberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1468Born
26 Sep 152254.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Havelberg, Germany
29 Oct 152254.8SucceededBishop of Havelberg, Germany
10 Nov 152254.8Ordained BishopBishop of Havelberg, Germany
4 May 154880.3DiedBishop of Havelberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Busso von Alvensleben (VIAF: 50057102)
Bishop Busso von Alvensleben (born 1468, died ) Bishop of Havelberg

  • a bishop for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,532, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast