Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Astorgius Almarici

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1478AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
6 Sep 1478Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
11 Dec 1480AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
1482²DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Astorgius Almarici
Archbishop Astorgius Almarici (died 1482) Archbishop of Vienne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt Jacques des Espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 256, and Page 268
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast