Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Allen, O.C.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
31 Jan 1353Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
15 Jan 1367DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Allen:
Bishop Nicolas Allen O.C.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Meath

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,683
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013