Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Alidosi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Apostolic Administrator of Bologna

Administrator of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460Born
6 Mar 150444.1AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
9 Apr 150444.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
26 Mar 150545.2AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
1 Dec 150545.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150545.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
11 Aug 150646.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
150747.0AppointedAdministrator of León, Spain
18 Oct 151050.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bologna, Italy
24 May 151151.3DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alidosi (VIAF: 33090204)
Francesco Cardinal Alidosi (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel del Río, Diocese of Imola
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRavenna

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 244
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 21, Number 33
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast